U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00130
  • Case Name: Trivett v. Bruce
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Stay]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 17, 2022: [Memorandum]
  • October 17, 2022: [Compel]
  • October 14, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 11, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • October 06, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 20, 2022: [Complaint]
  • September 20, 2022: [Case Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.