U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00131
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Mays et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Remark (Public)]
  • December 01, 2022: [Letter]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • October 05, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 28, 2022: [Response to Notice of Deficiency]
  • September 21, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Case No Longer Referred]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.