U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00499
  • Case Name: Bird v. Exel, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 21, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 21, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.