U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00502
  • Case Name: Whiteside v. Sprint et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 06, 2023: [Discovery]
  • January 06, 2023: [Strike]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 22, 2022: [Response]
  • December 22, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 13, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 12, 2022: [Request for Admissions]
  • December 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 08, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 02, 2022: [Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 21, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 04, 2022: [Reply]
  • November 01, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 17, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 17, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 14, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2022: [Mail Returned]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 27, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 27, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 21, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 21, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.