U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00132
  • Case Name: Storey v. Evansville Marine Service, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Case]
  • December 27, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 22, 2022: [Rule 73 Notice of Magistrate Judges - Trial by Consent]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 29, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • October 13, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • September 22, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 21, 2022: [Complaint]
  • September 21, 2022: [Case Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.