U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00122
  • Case Name: Harris v. Wesley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Entry of Default]
  • January 18, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 10, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Leave to]
  • December 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 07, 2022: [Discovery]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Response to Notice of Deficiency]
  • September 22, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 22, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • September 22, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 22, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 22, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • September 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.