U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00501
  • Case Name: Jackson v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 19, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 05, 2023: [Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 02, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • December 02, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 02, 2022: [Leave to]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 13, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 11, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 22, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • September 22, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.