U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00505
  • Case Name: Hopkins v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • December 02, 2022: [Social Security Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Attachments]
  • November 21, 2022: [SSA Administrative Record]
  • November 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice of Social Security Case Assignment]
  • October 12, 2022: [SSA Notice of Service]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 23, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • September 23, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.