U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00124
  • Case Name: Williams v. Rigsby et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Modify]
  • October 11, 2022: [Response to Notice of Deficiency]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 28, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 23, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 23, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • September 23, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.