U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00125
  • Case Name: Acuity v. Dhruv Management Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Rule 26 Disclosure Statement]
  • December 05, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 17, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 09, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 19, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • October 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 13, 2022: [Leave to]
  • October 13, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • October 12, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 07, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 23, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • September 23, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 23, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.