U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00511
  • Case Name: Burnett v. Faurecia Emissions Control Systems NA, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 29, 2025: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Bill of Costs]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Pro Hac Vice Renewal Payment]
  • October 07, 2024: [Invoice Pro Hac Vice Renewal Fee - For PHV Clerk Only]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • November 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 22, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • September 26, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 26, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.