U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00551
  • Case Name: Toogood v. Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • December 06, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 02, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • November 07, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 03, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • October 14, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 14, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • October 14, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.