U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00582
  • Case Name: Aldridge v. Ramey et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
February, 2025
  • February 14, 2025: [Modify]
December, 2024
  • December 11, 2024: [Status Conference]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Warning Order Attorney Report]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Compel]
  • September 30, 2024: [Sanctions]
  • September 30, 2024: [Show Cause]
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • November 04, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 02, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • November 02, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • November 02, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.