U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00590
  • Case Name: Perrenot v. Trans Union, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Settlement]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 18, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 17, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 03, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.