U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00154
  • Case Name: Hart v. Mariner Finance, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 01, 2022: [Rule 73 Notice of Magistrate Judges - Trial by Consent]
  • December 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • November 11, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 10, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 10, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 09, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 07, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • November 03, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
  • November 03, 2022: [Case Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.