U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00592
  • Case Name: Morgan v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice of Social Security Case Assignment]
  • December 06, 2022: [SSA Notice of Service]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 15, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • November 04, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • November 04, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 04, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.