U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00591
  • Case Name: Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice of Social Security Case Assignment]
  • November 17, 2022: [SSA Notice of Service]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 09, 2022: [Response to Notice of Deficiency]
  • November 07, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 07, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • November 04, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • November 04, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 04, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.