U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00601
  • Case Name: Walker v. Walmart, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement]
  • December 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 10, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • November 10, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.