U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00648
  • Case Name: Willibaum v. Smith et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 10, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • October 10, 2024: [Scheduling Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 19, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 08, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • December 08, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 08, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.