U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00675
  • Case Name: Gallusser et al v. The Silly Axe Cafe, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 18, 2023: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 18, 2023: [Response]
  • January 04, 2023: [Deficiency]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 20, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • December 20, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.