U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-00018
  • Case Name: Hampton v. Hyundai Capital America, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 10, 2025: [Status Report]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Status Report]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Modify]
  • October 07, 2024: [Status Report]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order of Recusal]
  • January 17, 2023: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 10, 2023: [Case Assignment]
  • January 10, 2023: [Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.