U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cv-00009
  • Case Name: Borneman et al v. Ford Motor Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • April 09, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • March 28, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [Rule 7.1(a)(2)Disclosure Statement - Diversity]
  • January 19, 2023: [Rule 73 Notice of Magistrate Judges - Trial by Consent]
  • January 18, 2023: [Deficiency]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • January 18, 2023: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 18, 2023: [Case Assignment]
  • January 18, 2023: [Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.