U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cv-00013
  • Case Name: Cottrell v. Triple J Trucking, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • March 19, 2025: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • January 23, 2023: [Summons Issued]
  • January 23, 2023: [Complaint]
  • January 23, 2023: [Case Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.