U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cv-00118
  • Case Name: Manire v. Vermeer Manufacturing Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Corporate and/or Diversity Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • March 19, 2025: [Pro Hac Vice Renewal Payment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Request for Fee Refund]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Dismiss]
  • October 01, 2024: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 26, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.