U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00516
  • Case Name: Street v. Marriott Vacations Worldwide et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • April 11, 2025: [Proposed Agreed Order]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • March 25, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • March 25, 2025: [Entry of Default]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Corporate and/or Diversity Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1)]
  • September 26, 2024: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.