U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00008
  • Case Name: Doe v. Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Corporate and/or Diversity Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 11, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • April 04, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 10, 2024: [Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.