U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00341
  • Case Name: Tomlin v. Comenity Bank et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • March 18, 2025: [Proposed Agreed Order]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Settlement]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Proposed Agreed Order]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.