U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cv-00073
  • Case Name: Oppong v. Owensboro Health Medical Group Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 19, 2025: [Proposed Agreed Order]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order of Recusal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.