U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-00503
  • Case Name: Lopes v. Louisville-Jefferson County Metro Government et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 18, 2025: [Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • March 17, 2025: [Status Report]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Status Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.