U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00026
  • Case Name: Oakman v. International United Automobile Aerospace and Agricultural Workers et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 27, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.