U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00153
  • Case Name: Harris v. Doe
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Letter]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 31, 2025: [Return of Service]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Schedules]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 30, 2024: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 30, 2024: [Case Assignment]
  • September 30, 2024: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.