U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00071
  • Case Name: Adkins v. Denny et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 07, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 07, 2025: [Compel]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • March 31, 2025: [Leave to]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • March 20, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.