U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-00183
  • Case Name: Stinson, et al v. Yum! Brands, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Pro Hac Vice Renewal Payment]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 01, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Pro Hac Vice Renewal Payment]
  • April 08, 2025: [Invoice Pro Hac Vice Renewal Fee - For PHV Clerk Only]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Schedules]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.