U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00347
  • Case Name: Ward v. Blue Canyon Property Management LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Deficiency]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.