U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-00476
  • Case Name: Kennedy et al v. Prime Hydration, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Rule 73 Notice of Magistrate Judges - Trial by Consent]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 08, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 14, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 05, 2025: [Deficiency]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.