U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-00102
  • Case Name: Erickson et al v. AIG Property Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Withdraw]
December, 2024
  • December 09, 2024: [Status Report]
November, 2024
  • November 19, 2024: [Reply]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order of Recusal]
  • October 02, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.