U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cv-00072
  • Case Name: Morris v. Morris Family Services
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 15, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 31, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Rule 26 Disclosure Statement]
  • October 04, 2024: [Rule 26 Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.