U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00093
  • Case Name: Edwards v. Bradley
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Return of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Return of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.