U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00152
  • Case Name: Harvey-Ogentho v. Hearell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 25, 2025: [Interrogatories Propounded]
  • April 25, 2025: [Request for Admissions]
  • April 25, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 07, 2025: [Response to Discovery Request]
  • April 07, 2025: [Request for Production of Documents]
  • April 07, 2025: [Compel]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • October 11, 2024: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.