U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00706
  • Case Name: Churchill Downs Incorporated et al v. Horseracing Integrity and Safety Authority, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 22, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order of Recusal]
  • March 18, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2025
  • January 02, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Government Agency]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.