U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00703
  • Case Name: Pope v. Rust-Oleum Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Rule 26 Disclosure Statement]
  • April 23, 2025: [Rule 26 Disclosure Statement]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • April 10, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 08, 2025: [Corporate and/or Diversity Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 07, 2025: [Corporate and/or Diversity Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1)]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 12, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 11, 2025: [Deficiency]
  • March 10, 2025: [Corporate and/or Diversity Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.