U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00245
  • Case Name: Premier Packaging, LLC v. Audion Automation, LTD.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 26, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Transfer Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.