U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00030
  • Case Name: Weatherly v. Gulf Offshore Logistics, L.L.C. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • April 16, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 08, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to United States Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to United States Attorney]
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • March 12, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.