U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00021
  • Case Name: Siddhivinayak Hospitality, LLC v. Graniti Vicentia, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Rule 73 Notice of Magistrate Judges - Trial by Consent]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 01, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 01, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Schedules]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summons Returned via Service by Secretary of State]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summons Returned via Service by Secretary of State]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Corporate and/or Diversity Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Deficiency]
  • March 17, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Deficiency]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Complaint]
  • March 13, 2025: [Case Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.