U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00147
  • Case Name: Bryant v. Rauls et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Leave to]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summons Returned via Service by Secretary of State]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Summons Returned via Service by Secretary of State]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.