U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00602
  • Case Name: McPherson v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Corporate and/or Diversity Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Entry of Default]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Deficiency]
  • April 15, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 15, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.