U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00130
  • Case Name: Robinson v. Prudential Insurance Company of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 23, 2025: [Transfer Case]
  • April 23, 2025: [Corporate and/or Diversity Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1)]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Proposed Agreed Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.