U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00014
  • Case Name: Wesco Insurance Company v. Inversiones M&V Soluciones Integrales CA Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 23, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 14, 2025: [Corporate and/or Diversity Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 11, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Response]
  • March 24, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 19, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.