U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00042
  • Case Name: United States of America v. An Easement and Right-of-Way Over 22.98 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Warren County, Kentucky et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Jury Demand]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Deposit Funds]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Rule 73 Notice of Magistrate Judges - Trial by Consent]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 07, 2025: [Answer to Notice of Condemnation]
  • April 07, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Deposit Funds]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Condemnation]
  • March 20, 2025: [Case Assignment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.