U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-00158
  • Case Name: Curran v. Miller et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 14, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 11, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 11, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Set Aside]
  • March 21, 2025: [Leave to]
  • March 21, 2025: [Corporate and/or Diversity Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.